This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 06/01/2022 at 23:15:52 (UTC).

Huntington & Son Well Pumps & Plumbing, Inc. vs. Chaz Maddrell et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 Huntington Son Well Pumps Plumbing, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Chaz Maddrell. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Vale, Thomas J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0226

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Vale, Thomas J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Huntington & Son Well Pumps & Plumbing, Inc.

301 3Rd Street

Brodhead, WI 53520

Defendants

Maddrell, Chaz

Monroe, WI 53566

Maddrell, Rebecca

Monroe, WI 53566

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell, Nathan Roland, Aty

Defendant Attorney

Sauer, John C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Location: Via Zoom Video/Phone; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002714, Payable Number: 90788, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002601, Payable Number: 90717, Receipt Number: 22R 003264, Amount: $118.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 13, 2022 at 10:00 am. NOH to parties INSTRUCTIONS HOW TO APPEAR REMOTELY (scheduled court event will held via video/telephone conferencing - Pursuant to the Courts Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sauer, John C.