This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 22:20:44 (UTC).

Horicon Bank vs. Len's Diamond Center, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/11/2022 Horicon Bank filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Len's Diamond Center, Inc. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Pfitzinger, Brian A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0469

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Pfitzinger, Brian A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Horicon Bank

326 E Lake Street

Horicon, WI 53032

Defendants

Len's Diamond Center, Inc.

C/O Leonard J. Lipski, Reg Agent, 110 Front Street

Beaver Dam, WI 53916

Lipski, Leonard

Beaver Dam, WI 53916

Lipski, Maureen

Beaver Dam, WI 53916

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: DODGE; Case number: 2022CV000469; Caption: Horicon Bank vs. Len's Diamond Center, Inc. et al; Total Amount: $39181.13; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Horicon Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 326 E Lake Street, Horicon, WI 53032 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Len's Diamond Center, Inc.; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Leonard J. Lipski, Reg Agent, 110 Front Street, Beaver Dam, WI 53916 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Leonard Lipski; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W8158 N Crystal Lake Road, Beaver Dam, WI 53916 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Maureen Lipski; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W8158 N Crystal Lake Road, Beaver Dam, WI 53916 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $35464.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Interest; Amount: $1384.59; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $1183.29; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $770.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Civil filing fee; Amount: $285.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $80.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $7.82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment/judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 136784, Payable Number: 249064, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: 2022-12-14 letter to Judge Pfitzinger

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of default; Additional Text: and Non-Military Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Motion for default judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment/prop. judgment; Additional Text: Order for Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Lens Diamond Center

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Leonard Lipski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Maureen Lipski

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 125022, Payable Number: 248077, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less