This case was last updated from Adams County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 01:10:31 (UTC).

Guild Mortgage Company, LLC vs. Jamie Kasten et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Guild Mortgage Company, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Jamie Kasten. This case was filed in Adams County Courts, Adams County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Wood, Daniel G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0047

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Adams, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Wood, Daniel G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guild Mortgage Company, LLC

5898 Copley Drive

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendants

Kasten, Jamie

Arkdale, WI 54613-8765

Lockwood, Jamie

Arkdale, WI 54613-9765

Kasten, Jane Doe

Arkdale, WI 54613-9765

Lockwood, John Doe

Arkdale, WI 54613-9765

Creative Finance, Inc.

815 Business Park Dr, C/O Lawrence Meade Jr., Ra

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965-9440

Mariner Finance, LLC

8040 Excelsior Dr, Ste 400, C/O Corporation Service Co, Ra

Madison, WI 53717-2915

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Foshag, William Nicholas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Motion hearing; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.; Court Reporter: Klaus, Kristi; Additional Text: No Appearances, Default Judgment - Order Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.; Additional Text: Cover Letter filed with AF,NMM and FFCLJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.; Additional Text: for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of mailing; Additional Text: Notice of Motion for Default Judgment with Statement regarding Fair Debt Collections Practices Act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: as to: Summons and Complaint on John Doe Lockwood

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Service Attempts Log

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: as to: Summons and Complaint on Jane Doe Kasten

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: as to: Summons and Complaint on Jamie Lockwood

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: as to: Summons and Complaint on Creative Finance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: as to: Summons and Complaint to Mariner Finance LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 020159, Payable Number: 74535, Receipt Number: 22R 001478, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Note, Mortgage, Lien Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foshag, William Nicholas