This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 18:38:50 (UTC).

Genesis Financial & Payment Systems WI, LLC dba USA Web Cash vs. Dakota Madosh

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 Genesis Financial Payment Systems WI, LLC dba USA Web Cash filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Dakota Madosh. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Sloma, Katherine and Hendrickson, Eric. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0292

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Sloma, Katherine

Hendrickson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Genesis Financial & Payment Systems WI, LLC dba USA Web Cash

425 Huehl Road, Building #2

Northbrook, IL 60062

Defendant

Madosh, Dakota

Shawano, WI 54166

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schaefer, Emma N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: sent to Dakota Madosh / Notice of entry of judgment and financial disclosure.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 014376, Payable Number: 183483, Receipt Number: 22R 007714, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHAWANO; Case number: 2022SC000292; Caption: Genesis Financial & Payment Systems WI, LLC dba USA Web Cash vs. Dakota Madosh; Total Amount: $1718.7; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Genesis Financial & Payment Systems WI, LLC dba USA Web Cash; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 425 Huehl Road, Building #2, Northbrook, IL 60062 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Dakota Madosh; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1331 S. Union street, Shawano, WI 54166 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1452.2; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 01:53 pm Defendant Dakota Madosh not in court, nor did (s)he/they file a written answer or contact the Clerk of Courts office prior to this hearing. Attorney Emma N. Schaefer not in court (not required). Default judgment granted. Judgment granted in the amount of $1,452.20 plus applicable costs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Sloma, Katherine; Additional Text: Amount requested on Summons and Complaint=$1452.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 012086, Payable Number: 182632, Receipt Number: 22R 006373, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: LOAN AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: LOAN HISTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims return date procedures

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less