This case was last updated from Fond Du Lac County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 18:12:25 (UTC).

First National Bank of Omaha vs. Robert C Gurrath et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 First National Bank of Omaha filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Robert C Gurrath. This case was filed in Fond Du Lac County Courts, Fond Du Lac County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Lavey, Laura J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0009

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Fond du Lac, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Lavey, Laura J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First National Bank of Omaha

Defendants

Gurrath, Robert C

Gurrath, Judith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kellum, Daniel E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Lavey, Laura J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Lavey, Laura J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Letter Regarding Order for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Personal Service for Summons & Complaint: ROBERT GURRATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Personal Service for Summons & Complaint: JUDITH GURRATH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 013902, Payable Number: 269578, Receipt Number: 23R 000975, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Judith Gurrath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Robert Gurrath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less