This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 04/22/2023 at 18:08:15 (UTC).

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation vs. Michael W Dabbs et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Michael W Dabbs. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in St. Croix, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schroeder, Bruce E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0180

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schroeder, Bruce E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Defendants

Dabbs, Michael W

Arnold, Sherri

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Bank of America NA

Unknown Spouse of Michael W Dabbs

Unknown Spouse of Sherri Arnold

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schmeling, Sara Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Schroeder, Bruce E.; Additional Text: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is Dismissed without prejudice and with release of lis pendens.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Schroeder, Bruce E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketEvent: Discharge of lis pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Motion to dismiss; Court Official: Schroeder, Bruce E.; Additional Text: filed by Atty Sara Schmeling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Court Official: Schroeder, Bruce E.; Additional Text: Notice of Motion and Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Court Official: Schroeder, Bruce E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens; Additional Text: Recorded w/ Register of Deeds.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Schroeder, Bruce E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 118290, Payable Number: 357955, Receipt Number: 23R 005609, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Exhibit A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Exhibit B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Exhibit C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less