This case was last updated from Fond Du Lac County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 14:18:07 (UTC).

Donald Wolff vs. Roundy's Supermarket's, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 Donald Wolff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Roundy's Supermarket's, Inc. This case was filed in Fond Du Lac County Courts, Fond Du Lac County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Christenson, Andrew J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0998

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Fond du Lac, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Christenson, Andrew J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wolff, Donald

Van Dyne, WI 54979-9731

Defendant

Roundy's Supermarket's, Inc.

C/O Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent, 8040 Excelsior Drive, Ste. 400

Madison, WI 53717-2915

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osowski, Beth D.

Defendant Attorney

Sanders, Maria

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Christenson, Andrew J.; Additional Text: Motion and Order RE: Failure to Comply With mediation Rule 5.4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Christenson, Andrew J.; Additional Text: Stipulated Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Christenson, Andrew J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Stip Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: Mediation Notice - mediation set for 11/14/2022 at 9:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 125369, Payable Number: 265941, Receipt Number: 22R 017882, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Christenson, Andrew J.; Court Reporter: Ford, Holly; Additional Text: Minutes filed Appearance by Atty Beth D Osowski, plaintiff's attorney. Appearance by Donald Wolff, plaintiff. Appearance by Atty Maria Sanders, defendant's attorney. Court orders mediation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Mediation agreement; Additional Text: No agreement - parties will return on Monday, November 14, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. to mediate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover Letter with proof of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Served John Long (Customer Service) for Roundy's Supermarkets personally 8/29/22 - sf $99.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Christenson, Andrew J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 111187, Payable Number: 265017, Receipt Number: 22R 016141, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less