This case was last updated from Portage County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 18:11:57 (UTC).

Discover Bank C/O Discover Products Inc vs. William V Braun

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Discover Bank C/O Discover Products Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against William. This case was filed in Portage County Courts, Portage County Circuit Court located in Portage, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Zell, Michael D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0011

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Portage, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Zell, Michael D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank C/O Discover Products Inc

Defendant

Braun, William V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kellum, Daniel E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: PORTAGE; Case number: 2023CV000011; Caption: Discover Bank C/O Discover Products Inc vs. William V Braun; Total Amount: $11768.21; Judgment Party; Party Name: Discover Bank C/O Discover Products Inc; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6500 New Albany Road East, New Albany, OH 43054 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: William V Braun; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3531 Patti Dr #2, Plover, WI 54467-4014 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $11407.71; Costs/Amount; Description: Costs and Disbursements; Amount: $360.5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Zell, Michael D.; Additional Text: /s/ MDZ 03-02-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Zell, Michael D.; Additional Text: /s/ MDZ 03-02-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Zell, Michael D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of no answer; Additional Text: Affidavit of No Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment; Additional Text: Proposed Order for Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed judgment; Additional Text: Proposed Judgment and Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Personal Service for Summons & Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 007296, Payable Number: 65212, Receipt Number: 23R 000594, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less