This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 01/11/2023 at 13:29:11 (UTC).

Debra L. Kussmaul et al vs. Billi Jo Leibfried et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Debra L Kussmaul filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Billi Jo Leibfried. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Day, Craig R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0210

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Day, Craig R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kussmaul, Debra L.

Fennimore, WI 53809

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Progressive Casualty Insurance Company

P.O. Box 84490

Cleveland, OH 44101

Leibfried, Billi Jo

Mount Hope, WI 53816

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Key, Daniel M

Pechota, Dominic Francis

Specht, Jonathan M

Rinkol, Raymond, Jr.

Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Hagen, Kristin M.

Calkins, Thomas Tyson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Court to advise matter has settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Motion and prop. order for withdrawal of counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Motion and order for withdrawal of counsel; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: & answer to cross claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Summons & Complaint on Progressive Casualty Co.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003442, Payable Number: 152607, Receipt Number: 22R 005568, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003210, Payable Number: 151940, Receipt Number: 22R 005084, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less