This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 21:49:23 (UTC).

Dairy State Bank vs. James E King et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 Dairy State Bank filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against James E King. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Bitney, J. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0302

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Bitney, J. M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dairy State Bank

16 South Main Street

Rice Lake, WI 54868

Defendants

King, James E

Sheldon, WI 54766

Rice Lake Harley-Davidson, Inc.

2801 S. Wisconsin Avenue

Rice Lake, WI 54868

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Todd Albert

Defendant Attorney

Heaney, Patrick G.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 086143, Payable Number: 129423, Receipt Number: 22RP002794, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Attorney Patrick Heaney appears on behalf of Rice Lake Harley-Davidson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and crossclaim; Additional Text: Rice Lake Harley-Davidson, Inc.'s Answer and Cross-Claim for Contribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Answer of James King

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Summons and Complaint served on Rice Lake Harley Davidson on 11/29/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Summons, Complaint and Electronic Filing Notice served on James King on 11/18/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 077139, Payable Number: 128865, Receipt Number: 22RP002469, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less