This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 12:31:12 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management, LLC vs. MONTREAL CARSON

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 Crown Asset Management, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONTREAL CARSON. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are SCC3 and Liggins, Alexis R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9217

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

SCC3

Liggins, Alexis R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management, LLC

3100 Breckinridge Blvd, Ste 725

Defendant

CARSON, MONTREAL

Milwaukee, WI 53206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Liggins, Alexis R.; Additional Text: This hearing was held via Zoom due to COVID-19. Attorney Kayla A Paleka appeared by video for Crown Asset Management, LLC. Defendant MONTREAL CARSON not in court. Action dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned for further proceedings on September 15, 2022 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned for further proceedings on September 15, 2022 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for CARSON, MONTREAL; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for MONTREAL CARSON Current: 2913 N 16th St, Milwaukee, WI 53206 United States (Effective: 08-26-2022) Prior: 4757 N 52ND ST, Milwaukee, WI 53218-5007 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for CARSON, MONTREAL; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for MONTREAL CARSON Current: 2913 N 16TH ST, Milwaukee, WI 53206 (Effective: 08-26-2022) Prior: 2913 N 16th St, Milwaukee, WI 53206 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Liggins, Alexis R.; Additional Text: This hearing was held via Zoom due to COVID-19. Attorney Kayla A Paleka appeared by video means for Plaintiff Crown Asset Management, LLC. Defendant MONTREAL CARSON not in court. Adjourned for further proceedings scheduled for September 15, 2022 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: vacant property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on August 11, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $988.0; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 069951, Payable Number: 1021800, Receipt Number: 22RP029871, Amount: $118.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A