This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 18:38:43 (UTC).

CreditBox.com, L.L.C. vs. Mary Prue

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 CreditBox com, L L C filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mary Prue. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kussel, William F., Jr and Hendrickson, Eric. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0293

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kussel, William F., Jr

Hendrickson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CreditBox.com, L.L.C.

2400 Devon Avenue Suite 300

Des Plaines, IL 60018

Defendant

Prue, Mary

Shawano, WI 54166

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schaefer, Emma N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 014378, Payable Number: 183483, Receipt Number: 22R 007714, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHAWANO; Case number: 2022SC000293; Caption: CreditBox.com, L.L.C. vs. Mary Prue; Total Amount: $3927.94; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: CreditBox.com, L.L.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2400 Devon Avenue Suite 300, Des Plaines, IL 60018 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Mary Prue; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: W7326 MAPLE AVE, Shawano, WI 54166 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3656.44; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 01:52 pm Defendant Mary Prue not in court, nor did (s)he/they file a written answer or contact the Clerk of Courts office prior to this hearing. Attorney Emma N. Schaefer not in court (not required). Default judgment granted. Judgment granted in the amount of $3,656.44 plus applicable costs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.; Additional Text: Amount requested on Summons and Complaint=$3656.44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 012087, Payable Number: 182632, Receipt Number: 22R 006373, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Loan Agreement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: LOAN TRANSACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims return date procedures

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less