This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 18:37:39 (UTC).

COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WISCONSIN vs. JERILYN A SHOOTER

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WISCONSIN filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JERILYN A SHOOTER. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kussel, William F., Jr and Hendrickson, Eric. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0302

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kussel, William F., Jr

Hendrickson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WISCONSIN

1901 Gateway Dr #200

Irving, TX 75038

THE CASH STORE A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1901 Gateway Dr #200

Irving, TX 75038

Defendant

SHOOTER, JERILYN A

Shawano, WI 54166

Garnishees

Oconto Falls Nursing and Rehab LLC

100 E Highland Dr

Oconto Falls, WI 54154

Meadowbrook at Oconto Falls

Oconto Falls, WI 54154

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hermersmann, Jason Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 016282, Payable Number: 183970, Receipt Number: 22R 008516, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 016282, Payable Number: 183970, Receipt Number: 22R 008516, Amount: $92.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 014388, Payable Number: 183486, Receipt Number: 22R 007719, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHAWANO; Case number: 2022SC000302; Caption: COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WISCONSIN vs. JERILYN A SHOOTER; Total Amount: $1698.65; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: COTTONWOOD FINANCIAL WISCONSIN; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1901 GATEWAY DR #200, Irving, TX 75038 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: JERILYN A SHOOTER; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 507 S. WASHINGTON ST, Shawano, WI 54166 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1427.15; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Hendrickson, Eric; Court Reporter: TAPE REPORTER; Additional Text: 01:46 pm Defendant JERILYN A SHOOTER not in court, nor did (s)he/they file a written answer or contact the Clerk of Courts office prior to this hearing. Attorney Jason Donald Hermersmann not in court (not required). Default judgment granted. Judgment granted in the amount of $1,427.15 plus applicable costs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.; Additional Text: Amount requested on Summons and Complaint=$1427.15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 012100, Payable Number: 182639, Receipt Number: 22R 006380, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims return date procedures

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less