This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2023 at 15:26:54 (UTC).

Conrad F. Richer vs. Gary E. Heck

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 Conrad F Richer filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gary E Heck. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0231

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richer, Conrad F.

Mount Horeb, WI 53572

Defendant

Heck, Gary E.

Arena, WI 53503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Frank, Ted N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Location: Iowa County Courthouse; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Interrogatories; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on February 20, 2023 at 01:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 1:23 PM Plaintiff Conrad F. Richer in court. Attorney Ted N Frank in court for Gary E. Heck. Another status. Status conference scheduled for February 20, 2023 at 01:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on January 9, 2023 at 01:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Miscellaneous information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on January 9, 2022 at 01:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 1:15 PM Plaintiff Conrad F. Richer in court. Attorney Ted N Frank in court for Gary E. Heck. Status set for January 9, 2023 at 1:00 pm. Status conference scheduled for January 9, 2022 at 01:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Motion to dismiss; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Richer, Conrad F.; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Conrad F. Richer Current: 500 Nordic Trail, Mount Horeb, WI 53572 United States (Effective: 11-02-2022) Prior: Mount Horeb, WI 53572 United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002919, Payable Number: 117981, Receipt Number: 22R 004914, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 22R 004851

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less