This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 05/26/2022 at 22:35:50 (UTC).

Citibank, N.A. vs. Michael Rupp

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Citibank, N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Rupp. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is SCC2. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2258

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

SCC2

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Rupp, Michael

West Allis, WI 53214-2809

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: SCC2; Location: Room 400; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 10, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $2715.85; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 046523, Payable Number: 1006713, Receipt Number: 22RP019617, Amount: $118.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court; Additional Text: Account Summary

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J