This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 08/22/2022 at 18:07:24 (UTC).

Central Wisconsin Community Action Council, Inc. vs. Michael W. McKittrick et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Central Wisconsin Community Action Council, Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Michael W McKittrick. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Screnock, Michael P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0228

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Screnock, Michael P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Central Wisconsin Community Action Council, Inc.

1000 State Highway 13

Defendants

McKittrick, Michael W.

McKittrick, Geraldine K.

Reedsburg, WI 53959

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smiley, William A

Defendant Attorneys

Von Hoff, Andrea Elizabeth

Buckner, Maximilian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 009605, Payable Number: 252693, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 009445, Payable Number: 252518, Receipt Number: 22R 013703, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Michael W. McKittrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for McKittrick, Geraldine K.; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Geraldine K. McKittrick Current: 2701 E Main St Lot 21, Reedsburg, WI 53959 United States (Effective: 06-30-2022) Prior: S1439 West Redstone Drive, La Valle, WI 53941 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Geraldine K. McKittrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 007643, Payable Number: 251634, Receipt Number: 22R 012086, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Exhibits A, B, C for Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Buckner, Maximilian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Von Hoff, Andrea Elizabeth