This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 06/17/2022 at 00:00:42 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. Michelle Christenson

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Cavalry SPV I, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Michelle Christenson. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Theresa M. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0023

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Theresa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cavalry SPV I, LLC

C/O Gurstel Law Firm, 622 N Water St #400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant

Christenson, Michelle

Hartford, WI 53027

Garnishee

Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc., A

7227 Lee Deforest Dr. Attn: Payroll

Columbia, MD 21046

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sharma, Anjali

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice for Christenson, Michelle; Additional Text: "A" garnishee: Maxim Healthcare Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 097555, Payable Number: 167102, Receipt Number: 22R 010713, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 097555, Payable Number: 167102, Receipt Number: 22R 010713, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Transcript of Judgment; County: WASHINGTON; Case number: 2022TJ000023; Caption: Cavalry SPV I, LLC vs. Michelle Christenson; Total Amount: $4598.84; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Original judgment entered 12/11/2020 and docketed on 3/23/2021 in Dodge County: case # 22SC1310; Judgment Party; Party Name: Cavalry SPV I, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Gurstel Law Firm, 622 N Water St #400, Milwaukee, WI 53202 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Michelle Christenson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1208 Kennedy Dr, Hartford, WI 53027 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Transcript of judgment fee; Amount: $10.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $4588.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Transcript of judgment filed; Additional Text: from Dodge County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $10.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 079405, Payable Number: 166835, Receipt Number: 22R 010277, Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharma, Anjali