This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 10/24/2023 at 13:12:23 (UTC).

In the Matter of Brian Winn

Case Summary

On 08/25/2023 In the Matter of Brian Winn was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Dane, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Esqueda, Carlo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0727

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Esqueda, Carlo

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Winn, Brian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2023

DocketEvent: Retrieval of will

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: dated December 6, 2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEvent: Received documents

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketEvent: Date of death

[+] Read More [-] Read Less