This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 06/19/2023 at 10:40:14 (UTC).

In the Estate of Rita M. Ensminger

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 In the Estate of Rita M Ensminger was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Dodge, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Behrens, Danell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0097

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Behrens, Danell

 

Party Details

Decedent

Ensminger, Rita M.

Not Yet Classified

Hankes, Gregory L.

Cline, Jeffrey J

Ensminger, Jack B

Ensminger, Ralph B, jr

Welker, Lawrence

Epping, Bernice

Hankes, Henrietta

Babich, Mary Ann

Knauft, Dennis

Kline, Daniel

Racette, Mary Kay

KCline, Jeffrey J

Faeh, Sharon

Hogan, Deborah

Brunet, Pamela

Welker, Claude F

Welker, Gary

Welker, Theresa

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Additional Text: Will dated 3/7/2014 admitted; Gregory Hankes issued Domiciliary Letters

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: Gregory L Hankes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Will dated 3/7/2014, Application for Informal Administration and Notice Setting Time to Hear Application sent to all parties (see list) via US Mail on 4/17/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice interested persons/time limit filing claims; Court Official: Behrens, Danell; Additional Text: Heirship hearing 5/18/23 9 am; deadline to file claims 7/28/23; publication Watertown Daily Times.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 046934, Payable Number: 252332, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Gregory Hankes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less