This case was last updated from Fond Du Lac County Courts on 07/21/2023 at 18:11:51 (UTC).

Voluntary Amortization of Debts of Jeff Ditter et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Voluntary Amortization of Debts of Jeff Ditter was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in Fond Du Lac County Courts, Fond Du Lac County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Nehls, Anthony C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0197

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Fond du Lac, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Nehls, Anthony C

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Ditter, Jeff

Ditter, Sonya

Trustee

Miske, Sandie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pietrek, David M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Nehls, Anthony C.; Additional Text: Order Approving

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Report; Additional Text: of Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: ORDER TO APPROVE PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Nehls, Anthony C.; Additional Text: Order to Amortization of Debts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Petition granted; Court Official: Nehls, Anthony C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Petition to Amortize Indebtedness

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $51.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 072878, Payable Number: 273626, Receipt Number: 23R 009679, Amount: $51.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit of Debts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less