This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 07/10/2023 at 12:57:28 (UTC).

In the Estate of Leo C. Ruhland

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 In the Estate of Leo C Ruhland was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Dodge, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Behrens, Danell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0112

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Behrens, Danell

 

Party Details

Decedent

Ruhland, Leo C.

Not Yet Classified

Wolter, Debra

Rhuland, Charlene

Ruhland, Anne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2024
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Karla Chase regarding incorrect date listed by Notary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Michelle M Olson regarding incorrect date listed by Notary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Claims deadline 9/1/23; Publication Dodge County Pionier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Additional Text: Will dated 1/28/2021 admitted; Domiciliary Letters issued to Debra Wolter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: Debra Wolter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 055020, Payable Number: 253385, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Debra Wolter, Anne Ruhland, Charlene Ruhland

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Debra Wolter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less