This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 09/17/2023 at 12:49:24 (UTC).

In the Estate of Jonathan Joe Herzog

Case Summary

On 07/19/2023 In the Estate of Jonathan Joe Herzog was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Dodge, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Pfitzinger, Brian A and Behrens, Danell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0139

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Pfitzinger, Brian A

Behrens, Danell

 

Party Details

Decedents

Herzog, Jonathan Joe

Herzog, Jonathon Joe

Not Yet Classified

Cameron, Terry Leigh

C, T L

Chase, Karla

Landmark Credit Union

Capital One NA Club Business

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Chase, Karla

Splittgerber, April Kutz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/18/2024

HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2024

HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Behrens, Danell

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketEvent: Receipt for claim; Additional Text: Full satisfaction of claim by Landmark Credit Union in the amount of $9,622.97

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketEvent: Withdrawn party for Landmark Credit Union

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketEvent: Claim against estate for Capital One NA Club Business; Amount: $11030.03

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23R 015930

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketEvent: Claim against estate for Landmark Credit Union; Amount: $9622.97

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 23R 015078

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketEvent: Proof of publication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
07/21/2023

DocketEvent: Order setting time to hear petition; Court Official: Behrens, Danell; Additional Text: Heirship hearing 8/21/23 at 11:15 am Branch 1; Deadline for filing claims 11/3/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketEvent: Petition for administration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 080239, Payable Number: 255421, Amount: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Terry Leigh Cameron, Attorney Karla Chase as Resident Agent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Terry Leigh Cameron, Cousin and personal representative nominated by the family; Sadie Lee O'Dell natural guardian for Samara Lisa Herzon, a minor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketEvent: Prop. order appointing GAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketEvent: Proposed order setting time to hear petition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2023

DocketEvent: Date of death

[+] Read More [-] Read Less