This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 09/12/2023 at 12:42:45 (UTC).

Dennis L. Giese vs. Karen Reiners and James Newhouse

Case Summary

On 07/14/2023 Dennis L Giese filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Karen Reiners and James Newhouse. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Dodge, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Seim, Steven and Pfitzinger, Brian A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0820

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Seim, Steven

Pfitzinger, Brian A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Giese, Dennis L.

Defendants

Reiners, Karen

Newhouse, James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chase, Karla

Defendant Attorney

Vanderloop, Jeremy R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023

HearingDescription: Telephone status conference; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Location: Circuit Court Branch 1; Type: Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketEvent: Response/reply; Additional Text: Reply to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $125.5; Additional Text: 23R 015420

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Notice of Hearing - TSC for James Newhouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone status conference on September 26, 2023 at 09:00 am.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 092680, Payable Number: 256568, Receipt Number: 23R 014968, Amount: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: for Defendants

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: and Counterclaim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Sent to Judicial Review - Answer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on August 25, 2023 at 12:45 pm.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Court Reporter: Mountin, Maria; Additional Text: 8:58 AM Plaintiff Dennis L. Giese in court. Attorney Karla Chase in court for Dennis L. Giese. Defendant Karen Reiners in court. Defendant James Newhouse in court. Discussion held on answer that was filed. Arguments heard. Discussion held on employment of def. Court advises def to retain counsel. Telephone scheduling conference scheduled for August 25, 2023 at 12:45 pm.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketEvent: Answer and counterclaim

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Sent to Judicial Review - Answer and counterclaim--Hearing to remain on calendar as scheduled

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketEvent: Contested

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: for Karen Reiners $40

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: for James Newhouse $40

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Seim, Steven; Additional Text: Eviction $10,800

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 080114, Payable Number: 255291, Amount: $114.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less