This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 22:41:44 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs. Tyrone P Dumas

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Capital One, N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tyrone P Dumas. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is SCC2. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1031

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

SCC2

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One, N.A.

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Dumas, Tyrone P

Milwaukee, WI 53218-1712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: SCC2; Location: ZOOM HEARING - SMALL CLAIMS; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on February 1, 2023 at 09:30 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Small Claims; Amount: $2275.93; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 004030, Payable Number: 1056471, Receipt Number: 23RP001940, Amount: $118.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less