This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2023 at 13:27:21 (UTC).

Capital One, N.A. vs. Justin Starr

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Capital One, N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Justin Starr. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in St. Croix, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0250

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One, N.A.

Defendant

Starr, Justin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003393, Payable Number: 118416, Receipt Number: 22R 005635, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003393, Payable Number: 118416, Receipt Number: 22R 005635, Amount: $92.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003396, Payable Number: 118414, Receipt Number: 22R 005633, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: IOWA; Case number: 2022SC000250; Caption: Capital One, N.A. vs. Justin Starr; Total Amount: $2546.25; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Capital One, N.A.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Justin Starr; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6612 STATE ROAD 191, Dodgeville, WI 53533 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $8.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2268.75; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 1:15 PM Plaintiff Capital One, N.A. not in court. Attorney James E Kachelski not in court. Defendant Justin Starr not in court. Default judgment granted plus costs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certified mail service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by certified mail; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Additional Text: CM#7020 2450 0001 3498 7442

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $122.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003223, Payable Number: 118248, Receipt Number: 22R 005370, Amount: $122.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less