This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 09/24/2022 at 12:34:08 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Michelle M Rainer

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michelle M Rainer. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are SCC2 and Roth, Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9397

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

SCC2

Roth, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Defendant

Rainer, Michelle M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Adjourned for further proceedings; Court Official: SCC2; Location: ZOOM HEARING - SMALL CLAIMS; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Roth, Susan; Additional Text: This hearing was held via Zoom due to COVID-19. Attorney James Kachelski appeared by video means for plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. Defendant Michelle Rainer not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: received and filed. kl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on August 26, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Defendant not known at address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $3592.6; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 070378, Payable Number: 1022128, Receipt Number: 22RP030091, Amount: $118.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Account summary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J