This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 05/31/2022 at 22:56:18 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. vs. Clarence Reath

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Clarence Reath. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hue, William F and Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0329

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hue, William F

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Reath, Clarence

Jefferson, WI 53549-1400

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Location: Room 124; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 22, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 15, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $6422.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 117206, Payable Number: 191810, Receipt Number: 22R 009193, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E