This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 01/13/2023 at 01:05:43 (UTC).

CAG National Fund I LLC vs. The Estate of Clara Quaas, Deceased et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 CAG National Fund I LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against The Estate of Clara Quaas, Deceased. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hetzel, Ryan J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0616

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hetzel, Ryan J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAG National Fund I LLC

15480 Laguna Canyon Road, Suite 100, C/O Rushmore Loan Management

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendants

Quaas, Deceased, The Estate of Clara

West Bend, WI 53095-8809

State of Wisconsin

114 East State Capitol, C/O Attorney General

Madison, WI 53703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Piette, Robert M

Defendant Attorney

Davenport, Anthony P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: filed by Atty Anthony P Davenport, for Defendant, State of Wisconsin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: and Demand for Surplus, filed by Atty A Davenport

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: of Mailing on 01/11/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: filed by A J/Gray & Assoc, dated 12/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: of auth'd copy of Summons and Complaint, for State of Wis/Atty General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint, signed by Christopher M Hueneke, Special Admin'r

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Copy of letter to heirs, filed by Atty C Hueneke, dated 12/14/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: filed by Atty Robert M Piette/Gray & Assoc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 214570, Payable Number: 172451, Receipt Number: 22R 022603, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Note, Mortgage and Lien Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davenport, Anthony P