This case was last updated from Rusk County Courts on 02/05/2023 at 02:48:49 (UTC).

Brian R Niepow vs. Janaye C Droske

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Brian R Niepow filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Janaye C Droske. This case was filed in Rusk County Courts, Rusk County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Barna, Annette M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0180

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rusk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Barna, Annette M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Niepow, Brian R

Glen Flora, WI 54526

Defendant

Droske, Janaye C

Ladysmith, WI 54848

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schoenborn, Bryce Alan

Defendant Attorney

Nussberger, Terry L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Barna, Annette M.; Location: Rusk County Courthouse; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - defendant; Additional Text: **AMENDED**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Plaintiff's written statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on April 10, 2023 at 10:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: dated 1/19/2023 to Judge Barna from Atty Schoenborn requesting to reschedule the pretrial.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Defendant's written statement; Additional Text: Statement of Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 035381, Payable Number: 49489, Receipt Number: 23R 003549, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: for PL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and counterclaim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 032398, Payable Number: 49278, Receipt Number: 22R 003238, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: for RE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Small Claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Rusk County Conference Line. Parties may call the conference line at 1-267-807-9605 access code 215782#

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $96.5; Additional Text: 22R 003147

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less