This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 01/10/2023 at 23:01:21 (UTC).

Brad Gerlach vs. James Bucheger

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Brad Gerlach filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against James Bucheger. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Kelly J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0019

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Kelly J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerlach, Brad

Park Falls, WI 54552

Defendant

Bucheger, James

Glidden, WI 54527

Other

All Stone Solutions, LLC

364 Division Street

Park Falls, WI 54552

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schwartz, Michael

Schwartz, Brandon

Defendant Attorney

Schoenborn, Bryce Alan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service on Rivard Stone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Affidavit of Brandon M. Schwartz in Support of Motion to Compel 12-27-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel 12-27-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service - Bourdeaux

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service - Deer Run

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Corporate Service on SiteOne Landscape Supply LLC, Bob Gustafson, Agent for C T Corporation System Inc. on July 8, 2022 by Process Server re: Subpoena & attachments.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Corporate Service on the Registered Agent, Rodney Paskewitz of Duro Rock Supply Co on July 8, 2022 by Process Server re: Subpoena & attachments.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Response/reply; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant James Bucheger's Counterclaims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Atty Bryce A Schoenborn, Slaby, Deda, Marchall, Reinhard & Writz LLP on behalf of defendant, James Bucheger.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer, affirmative defense and cross claim; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Regarding Payments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Regarding Payments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Regarding Payments

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: 30303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 017783, Payable Number: 81061, Receipt Number: 22R 001231, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schoenborn, Bryce Alan