This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 10/11/2022 at 12:45:25 (UTC).

Black River Memorial Hospital vs. Rachel S Goodwin

Case Summary

On 08/12/2022 Black River Memorial Hospital filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rachel S Goodwin. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bjerke, Todd W and Wickler, Jody R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0881

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bjerke, Todd W

Wickler, Jody R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Black River Memorial Hospital

Po Box 2288

La Crosse, WI 54602

Defendants

Goodwin, Rachel S

Rockland, WI 54653

Schindler, Rachel S

Rockland, WI 54653

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Doyle, Steven Patrick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Wickler, Jody R; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 007409, Payable Number: 196137, Receipt Number: 22R 012960, Amount: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Goodwin, Rachel S; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Rachel S Goodwin Current: 208 N Ondell Street, Rockland, WI 54653 (Effective: 09-30-2022) Prior: 208 N Ondell Street, Rockland, WI 54653 United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Goodwin, Rachel S; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Rachel S Goodwin Current: 208 N Ondell Street, Rockland, WI 54653 United States (Effective: 08-12-2022) Prior: 208 N Ondell Street, Readstown, WI 54652 US

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Vacate judgment; Additional Text: S&C mail returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Reopen; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service for Goodwin, Rachel S; Additional Text: Judgement/Notice of Entry of Judgement and Order for Financial Disclosure.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 006819, Payable Number: 195694, Receipt Number: 22R 012060, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2022SC000881; Caption: Black River Memorial Hospital vs. Rachel S Goodwin; Total Amount: $7403.77; Satisfaction: Other; Judgment Party; Party Name: Black River Memorial Hospital; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 2288, La Crosse, WI 54602 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Rachel S Goodwin; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 208 N Ondell Street, Rockland, WI 54653; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $7132.27; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $116.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2022-09-28; Type: Vacate judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Bjerke, Todd W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: s&c returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 006079, Payable Number: 194987, Receipt Number: 22R 010913, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Doyle, Steven Patrick