This case was last updated from Marinette County Courts on 08/21/2022 at 18:23:17 (UTC).

Barbera Glesner vs. American Family Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Barbera Glesner filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against American Family Insurance Company. This case was filed in Marinette County Courts, Marinette County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Morrison, James A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0131

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Marinette, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Morrison, James A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glesner, Barbera

Defendant

American Family Insurance Company

8040 Escelsior Dr., Ste. 400, C/O Corporation Services Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lein, Matthew Curtiss

Defendant Attorney

Budzinski, Gina D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002943, Payable Number: 90899, Receipt Number: 22R 004804, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Atty Gina Budzinski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: (Defendant's)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: for American Family Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants and Involuntary Plaintiffs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002516, Payable Number: 90467, Receipt Number: 22R 004095, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Budzinski, Gina D