This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 09/18/2022 at 18:10:47 (UTC).

Barbara Jean Weyer et al vs. Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Barbara Jean Weyer filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Babler, James C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0181

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Babler, James C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Weyer, Barbara Jean

Weyer, Patrick

Defendants

Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company

301 S. Bedford St., C/O Ct Corporation System

Mid-Century Insurance Company

8040 Excelsior Dr., Ste. 400, C/O Corporation Service Co

American Family Insurance Company

8040 Escelsior Dr., Ste. 400, C/O Corporation Services Co

Jimale, Isse

Sahra, Said

Not Yet Classified

US Department of Health and Human Services

222 W. Washington Ave., Suite 700, C/O Leslie Herje

State of Wisconsin Dept of Health Servicse

One West Wilson Street, Room 651

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lein, Matthew Curtiss

Defendant Attorneys

Pranschke, Kirsten E.

Gunderson, Wendy G

Kirchner, Kevin

McKenzie, Megan

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Welch, Allison M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulation for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer to crossclaim; Additional Text: Plaintiffs' Answer to Cross-Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer to crossclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company's Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Answer to All Claims, Cross-Claims and Subrogation Claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Additional Text: Order to Dismiss the State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Party dismissed for State of Wisconsin Dept of Health Servicse; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Additional Text: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Attorney Allison Welch appears on behalf of State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Additional Text: Proposed Order to Dismiss the State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of substitute service; Additional Text: Summons and Complaint served on Abdul Sahra on behalf of Said Sahra on 7/23/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons, Complaint and Attorney Letter served on Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company on 7/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons, Complaint and Attorney Letter served on American Family Insurance Company on 7/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons, Complaint and Attorney Letter served on Mid-Century Insurance Company on 7/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons, Complaint and Attorney Letter served on U.S. Department of Health and Human Services on 7/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons, Complaint and Attorney Letter served on State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services on 7/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 043104, Payable Number: 127301, Receipt Number: 22RP001647, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: 7/20/22 Letter from Attorney Lein to Insurance Companies regarding Vogt Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Welch, Allison M