This case was last updated from Walworth County Courts on 08/26/2022 at 17:08:24 (UTC).

Associated Bank, NA vs. Estate of Thomas D. Cavanaugh et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 Associated Bank, NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Estate of Thomas D Cavanaugh. This case was filed in Walworth County Courts, Walworth County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Reddy, David M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0458

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Walworth, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Reddy, David M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Associated Bank, NA

1305 Main Street

Defendants

Estate of Thomas D. Cavanaugh

C/O Russell J. Karnes, Special Admin, 330 E Kilbourn Ave, #1170

DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.

C/O Corporation Service Company - Reg. Ag., 8040 Excelsior Dr, #400

United States of America - Dept. of HUD

C/O United States Attorney, 517 E Wisconsin Ave, Rm 530

State of Wisconsin, Dept. of Revenue

2135 Rimrock Rd

Walworth County

C/O County Clerk, 100 W Walworth Street

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Comella, Matthew

Thoms, Emily E.

Hillmann, Shawn R

Arrigo, Jordan

Bailey, Karsten C

Defendant Attorney

McNeilly, James W., Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service for DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service for United States of America

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service for the USA, Certified Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service for State of Wisconsin, Department of Revenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service for Walworth County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Adam Ben-Zikri and James W. McNeiley, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Admission of Service - Estate of Thomas D. Cavanaugh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 230421, Payable Number: 266907, Receipt Number: 22R 014529, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McNeilly, James W., Jr.