This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 12/16/2022 at 22:41:21 (UTC).

Ally Capital Corp. d/b/a Ally Bank vs. Austin T. Yadro

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Ally Capital Corp d/b/a Ally Bank filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Austin T Yadro. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1560

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Capital Corp. d/b/a Ally Bank

P.O. Box 130424

Roseville, MN 55113

Defendant

Yadro, Austin T.

Cedar Grove, WI 53013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Enstrom, Zachary L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Replevin return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Location: Room B-10; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment; Additional Text: of Replevin.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Summons and Complaint, etc., served on Austin T. Yadro on DECEMBER 8, 2022 by East Central Wisconsin Process. (55.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: From Court to all litigants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 014229, Payable Number: 371091, Receipt Number: 22R 021316, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Enstrom, Zachary L.