This case was last updated from Kewaunee County Courts on 09/19/2022 at 13:02:11 (UTC).

Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC vs. Katherine C Rose

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Katherine C Rose. This case was filed in Kewaunee County Courts, Kewaunee County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Wisnicky, Jeffrey R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0129

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Kewaunee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Wisnicky, Jeffrey R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Absolute Resolutions Investments, LLC

622 N Water St #400, C/O Gurstel Law Firm P.C.

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant

Rose, Katherine C

Luxemburg, WI 54217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sharma, Anjali

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulation for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order for Stipulated Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Wisnicky, Jeffrey R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial; Court Official: Wisnicky, Jeffrey R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter requesting adjournment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: From Attorney Anjali Sharma

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on September 19, 2022 at 09:15 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003779, Payable Number: 63329, Receipt Number: 22R 003052, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: Attorney Anjali Sharma

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharma, Anjali