This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 01/10/2023 at 15:24:42 (UTC).

A-Z Enterprises Inc DBA Nor Pines Plumbing vs. Steven K Thomas et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 A-Z Enterprises Inc DBA Nor Pines Plumbing filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Steven K Thomas. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Kelly J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0014

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Kelly J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-Z Enterprises Inc DBA Nor Pines Plumbing

52085 N Lake Owen Drive

Drummond, WI 54832

Not Yet Classified

Thomas, Steven K

New London, WI 54961

3Rd Party Defendant

Manthey, Douglas

Drummond, WI 54832

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Heaney, Patrick G.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Wickman, Tyler William

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: To Counterclaim and Cross-claim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 035329, Payable Number: 81518, Receipt Number: 22R 002120, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Atty Patrick G Heaney, Thrasher, Pelish & Heaney, LTD on behalf of Plaintiff, A-Z Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Nor Pines Plumbing & Third-Party Defendant, Douglas Manthey.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Exhibit A For Counterclaims and Cross Claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Renumber from; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: 2022SC000022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Douglas Manthey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Upgrade to civil from small claims; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Ltr to parties from Clerk re: upgrade to Civil from Small Claims; Case 22CV14.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Counterclaim - Claim against Pltf(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $125.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 017655, Payable Number: 80937, Receipt Number: 22R 000980, Amount: $125.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 009006, Payable Number: 80896, Receipt Number: 22R 000949, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Atty Tyler W Wickman, Anich, Wickman & Lindsey SC on behalf of Defendant, Steven K Thomas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $75.0; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Personal Service on Steven Thomas on Feb. 10, 2022 by WCSD re: Summons & Complaint & attachments.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Mar. 2, 2022 at 8:00 am. Claim for money.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 22R 000593

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Steven K Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heaney, Patrick G.