This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 04/08/2022 at 13:02:14 (UTC).

A-Z Enterprises Inc DBA Nor Pines Plumbing vs. Steven K Thomas

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 A-Z Enterprises Inc DBA Nor Pines Plumbing filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Steven K Thomas. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Kelly J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0022

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Kelly J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-Z Enterprises Inc DBA Nor Pines Plumbing

52085 N Lake Owen Drive

Drummond, WI 54832

Defendant

Thomas, Steven K

New London, WI 54961

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wickman, Tyler William

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Douglas Manthey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Court Reporter: Berhow, Becky; Additional Text: 08:00 AM Attorney Tyler William Wickman appeared by video means for Defendant Steven K Thomas. Douglas Manthey on behalf of Plaintiff A-Z Enterprises Inc DBA Nor Pines Plumbing in court. Atty Wickman appears for defendant, file contains Answer & counterclaim. Atty comments, should be converted to large claims. Plntff has not rec'd a copy of Answer & counterclaim. Atty comments, filed yesterday, will have served. Ct printed copy for plntff. Ct states case to be converted to CV case. Plntff can accept service at Atty's office.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Upgrade to civil from small claims; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Renumber to; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: 2022CV000014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Administrative disposition; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Counterclaim - Claim against Pltf(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: Counterclaims & Cross Claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $125.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 017655, Payable Number: 80937, Receipt Number: 22R 000980, Amount: $125.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 009006, Payable Number: 80896, Receipt Number: 22R 000949, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Atty Tyler W Wickman, Anich, Wickman & Lindsey SC on behalf of Defendant, Steven K Thomas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $75.0; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Personal Service on Steven Thomas on Feb. 10, 2022 by WCSD re: Summons & Complaint & attachments.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Mar. 2, 2022 at 8:00 am. Claim for money.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 22R 000593

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Steven K Thomas

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wickman, Tyler William