This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 21:28:07 (UTC).

The Loan Store vs. William Kvapil et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2003 The Loan Store filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against William Kvapil. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Vernon, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderl, Julie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1689

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderl, Julie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Loan Store

Defendants

Kvapil, William

Kvapil, Lynn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2010
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Kvapil, William; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for William Kvapil Current: 917 S Riverside Dr, Cornell, WI 54732 United States (Effective: 05-03-2010) Prior: 15182 Hwy 178, Jim Falls, WI 54748 United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Kvapil, William; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for William Kvapil Current: 15182 Hwy 178, Jim Falls, WI 54748 United States (Effective: 12-26-2003) Prior: 15182 Hwy 178 Lot 21, Jim Falls, WI 54748 United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to The Loan Store enclosing requested information on file.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Wm. Kvapil requesting court to satisfy judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2007
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Mr. Kvapil regarding his request to correct the record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2007
  • DocketEvent: Request to correct error in court records; Additional Text: filed by William Kvapil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2004
  • DocketEvent: Contempt hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Minutes; filed. No contempt found at this time. Judge Orders defs must be personally served with OTSC before a hearing can proceed. Informed Plaintiff of the same.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: for Contempt Hearing set 6/21/04, 8:30 a.m.n Notices mailed to all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2004
  • DocketEvent: Writ of replevin; Additional Text: returned partially satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Replevin Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Writ of replevin; Additional Text: copy of - original forwarded to Sheriff's Dept at request of Plaintiff w/instructions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001689; Caption: The Loan Store vs. William Kvapil et al; Total Amount: $106.0; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment - Collateral per Replevin Judgment on file; Judgment Party; Party Name: The Loan Store; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2315 N Hwy 52, Rochester, MN 55901; Judgment Party; Party Name: William Kvapil; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 917 S Riverside Dr, Cornell, WI 54732; Judgment Party; Party Name: Lynn Kvapil; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 15182 Hwy 178 Lot 21, Jim Falls, WI 54748; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $14.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2004-03-09; Type: Writ of replevin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted pending the filing of the replevin judgment of signature.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service by return receipt; Additional Text: Signed by Lynn Kvapil for Lynn & Wm Kvapil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Certified Mail $14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 017436

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less