This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 21:27:58 (UTC).

The Loan Store vs. Kurt Burish

Case Summary

On 12/26/2003 The Loan Store filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kurt Burish. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderl, Julie. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1691

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Anderl, Julie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Loan Store

Defendant

Burish, Kurt

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Replevin Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Writ of replevin; Additional Text: copy of - original mailed to The Loan Store at their request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001691; Caption: The Loan Store vs. Kurt Burish; Total Amount: $99.0; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment - Collateral per Replevin Judgment on file; Judgment Party; Party Name: The Loan Store; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2315 N Hwy 52, Rochester, MN 55901; Judgment Party; Party Name: Kurt Burish; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 5689 290th St, Cadott, WI 54727; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $7.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2004-03-09; Type: Writ of replevin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted pending filing of the replevin judgment for signature

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2004
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service by return receipt; Additional Text: signed by Susanne Wundrow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 017439

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Certified Mail $7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less