This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 21:28:01 (UTC).

The Loan Store vs Julie Billingsley

Case Summary

On 12/26/2003 The Loan Store filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Julie Billingsley. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderl, Julie. The case status is Not Yet Classified.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1690

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Anderl, Julie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Loan Store

Defendant

Billingsley, Julie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001690; Caption: The Loan Store vs Julie Billingsley; Total Amount: $89.0; Property/Remarks: Replevin Judgment per Order to Vacate Stipulated Dismissal and Enter Judgment - Collateral per Affidavit on file; Judgment Party; Party Name: The Loan Store; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2315 N Hwy 52, Rochester, MN 54729; Judgment Party; Party Name: Julie Billingsley; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 517 E South Ave, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $7.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: to Vacate Stipulated Dismissal and Enter Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2004
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Noncompliance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Dismissed per Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Copies mailed to parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2004
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service by return receipt; Additional Text: signed by Don Billingssley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Certified Mail $7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 017438

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less