This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/14/2022 at 10:49:08 (UTC).

Royal Credit Union vs. Matthew L Gillett et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2003 Royal Credit Union filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Matthew L Gillett. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderl, Julie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1286

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Anderl, Julie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Royal Credit Union

P.O. Box 970, 419 N. Hastings Pl

Eau Claire, WI 54702-0970

Defendants

Gillett, Matthew L

Boyd, WI 54726

Gillett, Lore

Thorpe, WI 54771-7808

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification; Additional Text: ORIGINAL ADDRESS INFO for Lore Gillett Prim. Addr. : N13964 Bachelors Ave Sec. Addr. : City : Thorp State : WI Zip : 54771-7607 Country : United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Additional Text: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2003
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2003
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2003
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant on 10/22/03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2003
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for replevin; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2003SC001286; Caption: Royal Credit Union vs. Matthew L Gillett et al; Total Amount: $212.9; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Replevin Judgment-Collateral per order on file. Amended judgment to reflect change of address for Lore Gillett. Copies mailed to plaintiff and defendant along with Financial Disclosure Statement.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Matthew L Gillett; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 8266 290th Street, Boyd, WI 54726; Judgment Party; Party Name: Lore Gillett; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N14376 Bachelors Ave, Thorpe, WI 54771-7808; Judgment Party; Party Name: Royal Credit Union; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: P.O. Box 970, 419 N. Hastings Pl, Eau Claire, WI 54702-0970; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $125.9; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Anderl, Julie; Additional Text: Return date hearing; court minutes filed; default judgment granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Anderl, Julie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2003
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification; Additional Text: ORIGINAL ADDRESS INFO for Matthew L Gillett Prim. Addr. : W14080 Spur Rd Sec. Addr. : City : Sheldon State : WI Zip : 54766-9071 Country : United States

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2003
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of substitute service; Additional Text: on Donita Kolpien for Matthew Gillett.$79.40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2003
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 03R 013130

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2003
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2003
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service--Mailed back to RCU for service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less