This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/17/2022 at 07:10:39 (UTC).

Marshfield Clinic vs. Suzanne C Seurer

Case Summary

On 01/12/2004 Marshfield Clinic filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Suzanne C Seurer. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, Jim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0055

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, Jim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

Marshfield Clinic

Marshfield, WI 54449

Alliance Collection Agencies, Inc

Po Box 1267

Marshfield, WI 54449

Defendant

Seurer, Suzanne C

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kostka, Timothy L, Esq

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $80.0; Additional Text: 04R 003765

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Garnishee Defendant - Marshfield Clinic; Amount of Creditor's Claim - $916.54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2004SC000055; Caption: Marshfield Clinic vs. Suzanne C Seurer; Total Amount: $802.4; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: Marshfield Clinic; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1000 N Oak Avenue, Marshfield, WI 54449; Judgment Party; Party Name: Suzanne C Seurer; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1457 W Willow St, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $693.4; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $25.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed. Default Judgment granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2004
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $84.0; Additional Text: 04R 000591

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Regular mail $2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kostka, Timothy L, Esq