This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/17/2022 at 07:16:46 (UTC).

Justin Brown et al vs. Alicia Calkins

Case Summary

On 01/12/2004 Justin Brown filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Alicia Calkins. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Isaacson, Jim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0029

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Isaacson, Jim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brown, Justin

Chetek, WI 54728

Herman, Lindsay

Eau Claire, WI 54701

Defendant

Calkins, Alicia

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2004
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: completed by Alicia Calkins - copy given to Ms. Herman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Rec'd FDS from Alicia Calkins unsigned. Returned to her for signature. JH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Additional Text: Mailed to Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2004SC000029; Caption: Justin Brown et al vs. Alicia Calkins; Total Amount: $637.7; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default Judgment; Judgment Party; Party Name: Lindsay Herman; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2130 Mitscher Ave, Eau Claire, WI 54701; Judgment Party; Party Name: Justin Brown; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2525 8 1/4 Ave, Chetek, WI 54728; Judgment Party; Party Name: Alicia Calkins; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 420 Pumphouse Apts #245, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $525.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $82.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $25.7; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Court Trial scheduled. No appearance by defendant. Default Judgment granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Copies of e-mail correspondence between Ms. Calkins and Ms. Herman agreeing debt is owed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: for Trial reset to 4/12/04, 2:00 p.m., requested by Ms. Herman. Notices mailed to parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: for change of trial date from 2/23 to 3/29. Notices sent to all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Return Date Hearing; Minutes, filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Isaacson, Jim; Additional Text: Replevin portion of claim settled. Ms. Calkins agrees to return TV to Plaintiffs. Monetary portion of claim contested. Trial set 2/23/04. Notices given in Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Call from Alicia Calkins - needs to reset trial due to medical appointment on 2/23/04. Requests court trial reset to end of March. Court Commissioner approves request. Trial reset to 3/29/04, 2:00 p.m., #1.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2004
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: On Alicia Calkins - $25.70

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filing Fee $82

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $82.0; Additional Text: 04R 000520

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less