This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 17:44:17 (UTC).

In the Matter of Howard W Day

Case Summary

On 12/26/2003 In the Matter of Howard W Day was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Sheboygan, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Stelzner, Katherine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0002

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Stelzner, Katherine

 

Party Details

Decedent

Day, Howard W

Not Yet Classified

Day, Marilyn L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketEvent: Records scanned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Edward Jones re income

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Petition waiving fiduciary income tax return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine; Additional Text: Waiving Fiduciary Income Tax Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2004
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: copies of bills for funeral

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2004
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $81745.27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2004
  • DocketEvent: Renumber from; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine; Additional Text: 2003WL000073

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2004
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2004
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2003
  • DocketEvent: Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less