This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 07/24/2022 at 17:44:13 (UTC).

In the Matter of Cynthia Lou Bohl

Case Summary

On 12/26/2003 In the Matter of Cynthia Lou Bohl was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Chippewa, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Cameron, Roderick A and Stelzner, Katherine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0020

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Cameron, Roderick A

Stelzner, Katherine

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bohl, Kenneth

Decedent

Bohl, Cynthia Lou

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/27/2015

DocketEvent: Records scanned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2005

DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Will removed and filed in 05PR78 - informal administration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2004

DocketEvent: Summary settlement-order of summary settlement; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2004

DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2004

DocketEvent: Renumber from; Court Official: Stelzner, Katherine; Additional Text: 2003WL000072

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2004

DocketEvent: Petition for summary settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2004

DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Cameron, Roderick A.; Additional Text: original file was Will only - now a Summary Settlement before Judge Cameron

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/26/2003

DocketEvent: Will

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2003

DocketEvent: Date of death

[+] Read More [-] Read Less