This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 02:45:11 (UTC).

In the Estate of Wayne D. Sonntag

Case Summary

On 12/26/2002 In the Estate of Wayne D Sonntag was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McMonigal, W. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0119

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McMonigal, W. M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Sonntag, Wayne D.

Not Yet Classified

Sonntag, Joyce E.

Green Lake, WI 54941

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Lehner, Michael P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver, consent and approval; Additional Text: Joyce Sonntag

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Joyce Sonntag acknowledges receipt of 1600 shares St. Francis Capital Corp; 15% ownership IBC services; Sundary Propertys; 1/2 interest vacant lot, 110 Dartford Rd-Ripon as full payment of her share of estate on 7/2/03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2003
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Final account and petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Re: Notice to Creditors.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2003
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Inventory mailed to Joyce E. Sonntag, David Sonntag, Dale Sonntag, Lynn D. Mirr, Douglas Sonntag, and Donald L. Sonntag.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2003
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $173890.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2003
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2003
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda; Additional Text: To: Joyce E. Sonntag. Note: Bond waived under Will.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Additional Text: Duly made by Joyce E. Sonntag, widow.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2003
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: To by-pass marital and family trust and allow the Personal Representative to distribute the assets to the surviving spouse. The petition is signed by all interested parties as well as the trustee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda; Additional Text: To by-pass marital & family trust and allow the personal representative to distribute the assets to the surviving spouse.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2003
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 50104 (Special administration) to 50102 (Informal proceedings).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2003
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Additional Text: To: Joyce E. Sonntag.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2003
  • DocketEvent: Oath; Additional Text: Of Special Administrator.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2002
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2002
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less