This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 07/19/2022 at 14:48:12 (UTC).

In the Estate of Sara L. Koepsell

Case Summary

On 10/25/2002 In the Estate of Sara L Koepsell was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McMonigal, W. M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0100

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McMonigal, W. M

 

Party Details

Decedents

Koepsell, Sarah L.

Koepsell, Sara L.

Not Yet Classified

Zimmerman, Karla

Markesan, WI 53946

Jahns, Tammy

Ripon, WI 54971

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Liska, Tammy J.

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2003
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Final account and petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Michelle Olson-Quincey, Becker, Schuessler, Militello & Chase-mailed a copy of Final Account on August 15, 2003 to : Andrew Zimmerman; William Zimmerman; Amanda Zimmerman; Jessica Zimmerman; Sara Zimmerman; Emmanuel Ruiz; Michael Zimmerman; Karla Zimmerman and Atty. Tammy Liska Jahns

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Karla Zimmerman acknowledges receipt of the residue of the estate as full payment of her share on August 14, 2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Karla Zimmerman as trustee for Emmanuel Ruiz acknowledges reciept of $28,7600.00 as distribution of funds to his trust on August 14, 2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Karla Zimmerman as trustee for Andrew Zimmerman acknowledges reciept of $28,7600.00 as distribution of funds to his trust on August 14, 2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Karla Zimmerman as trustee for Amanda Zimmerman acknowledges reciept of $28,7600.00 as distribution of funds to his trust on August 14, 2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2003
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Karla Zimmerman as trustee for Jessica Zimmerman acknowledges reciept of $28,7600.00 as distribution of funds to his trust on August 14, 2003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2003
  • DocketEvent: Report; Additional Text: Filed by Tammy Liska Jahns, G.A.L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2003
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Re: Notice to Interested Parties and Notice to Creditors.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2002
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Notice to Interested Persons/Creditors and Last Will and Testament mailed to all (21) interested parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • DocketEvent: Amended; Additional Text: Application for Informal Probate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • DocketEvent: Order of notice/inter.persons/time to file claims; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda; Additional Text: Hearing on Application scheduled for January 7, 2003. Expiration date for filing claims February 28, 2003.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: McMonigal, W. M.; Court Reporter: Sosinsky, Brenda; Additional Text: Tammy Liska Jahns appointed as G.A.L. for minor heirs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2002
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Additional Text: Duly made by Karla Zimmerman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2002
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2002
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter from the Register in Probate to Karla Zimmerman, the named P.R. under the Will, that the wrong type of probate may have been initiated, explaining Notice to Interested Parties & Creditors. Also, pointing out that there are minors involved and a G.A.L. would be needed. The recommendation is made to seek legal counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2002
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Liska, Tammy J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chase, Karla