This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 07/21/2022 at 12:24:24 (UTC).

In the Estate of Samuel George Bigelow

Case Summary

On 04/10/2003 In the Estate of Samuel George Bigelow was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Trempealeau, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Grover, Thomas G and Habeck, James R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0051

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Grover, Thomas G

Habeck, James R

 

Party Details

Decedent

Bigelow, Samuel George

Shawano, WI 54166

Not Yet Classified

Madsen, Thomas B.

Gresham, WI 54128-0263

Talbot, Laurie

Allison Park, PA 15101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2004
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Grover, Thomas G.; Court Reporter: FTR / Sherri Kubowicz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2004
  • DocketEvent: Transfer at disposition; Court Official: Grover, Thomas G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2004
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Grover, Thomas G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Claims disposed; Additional Text: State of WI Estate Recovery Program - Release of Claim (fax copy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: for Discharge of Special Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Additional Text: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2004
  • DocketEvent: Claims disposed; Additional Text: State of WI Estate Recovery Program (original)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2004
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: of Estate Administration Deadlines

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2003
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $4524.28; Additional Text: WI Estate Recovery Program

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 1 of 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Habeck, James R.; Court Reporter: Bostwick, Nina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Letters issued; Court Official: Habeck, James R.; Court Reporter: Bostwick, Nina; Additional Text: Letters of Special Administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2003
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2003
  • DocketEvent: Probate claims notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2003
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2003
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less