This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 06/27/2022 at 00:34:05 (UTC).

In the Estate of Robert E. Penberthy

Case Summary

On 10/24/2000 In the Estate of Robert E Penberthy was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dyke, William D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0069

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dyke, William D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Penberthy, Robert E.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Not Yet Classified

Slack, Barbara J.

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Penberthy, Helen

Dodgeville, WI 53533

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Mckinley, Timothy B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2005
  • DocketEvent: Microfilm #; Additional Text: #387

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2003
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2003
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: final - Helen Penberthy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2002
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Additional Text: to Barbara Slack

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2001
  • DocketEvent: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Finding and order (summary proceedings); Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2001
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2000
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2000
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2000
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2000
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2000
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2000
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Court Official: Dyke, William D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2000
  • DocketEvent: Order and notice for hearing; Court Official: Dyke, William D.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2000
  • DocketEvent: Termination of decedent's property interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2000
  • DocketEvent: Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2000
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mckinley, Timothy B.